## Samacheer Kalvi 3rd Standard Maths Book Solutions Term 2 Chapter 1 Numbers

Complete the following table. (Text Book Page No. 2):

Ans:

Repeated adddition.

ii) Find the total number of leaves.

Ans:

4 + 4 + 4 + 4 + 4 = 16

4 × 4 = 16

iii) How many apples are there in four plates.

Ans:

There are four plates. Each has five apples.

Total number of apples = 5 + 5 + 5 + 5 = 20 ⇒ 5 × 4 = 20

Activity (Text Book Page No. 5):

Ans:

Exercise (Text Book Page No. 5):

Ans:

Activity (Text Book Page No. 7):

Shall we say the multiples of 3.

Ans:

Multiples of 3 = 3, 6, 9, 12, 15, 18.

Exercise (Text Book Page No. 7):

Question 1.

Fill in the following tables:

Ans:

Question 2.

Fill in the boxes.

a. 6 × 3 =

Ans:

18

b. 5 × 3 =

Ans:

15

c. 3 × 3 =

Ans:

9

d. × 3 = 9

Ans:

3

e. 10 × 3 =

Ans:

30

f. 3 × 6 =

Ans:

18

g. 8 × 3 =

Ans:

24

h. 2 × = 6

Ans:

3

i. 4 × 3 =

Ans:

12

j. 3 × 10 =

Ans:

30

k. 3 × 4 =

Ans:

12

l. 9 × 3 =

Ans:

27

Exercise (Text Book Page No. 9):

Question 1.

Complete the table.

Ans:

Question 2.

If there are 4 toys in a box, how many toys will be there in 5 boxes?

Ans:

4 × 5 = 20

Question 3.

Fill in the boxes.

a. 3 × = 12

Ans:

4

b. 5 × 4 =

Ans:

20

c. × 4 = 28

Ans:

7

d. 9 × 4 =

Ans:

36

e. 6 × = 24

Ans:

4

f. × 3 = 12

Ans:

4

g. 4 × = 12

Ans:

3

h. × 4 = 40

Ans:

10

Exercise (Text Book Page No. 11):

Question 1.

Fill in the blanks.

a. ___ × 5 = 10

Ans:

2

b. 4 × ___ = 20

Ans:

5

c. 6 × 5 = ___

Ans:

30

d. 9 × ___ = 45

Ans:

5

e. ___ × 5 = 50

Ans:

10

Question 2.

If there are 6 roses in a vase, how many roses will be there in 6 vases?

× =

Ans:

6 × 6 = 36

Exercise (Text Book Page No. 13):

Complete the following table.

Ans:

Exercise (Text Book Page No. 13):

Question 1.

Multiply the following numbers by regrouping.

(i) 75 × 8

Ans:

75 × 8 = (70 + 5) × 8

= 560 + 40 = 600

(ii) 26 × 5

Ans:

26 × 5 = (20 + 6) × 5

= 100 + 30 = 130

(iii) 372 × 6

Ans:

372 × 6 = (300 + 70 + 2) × 6

= 1800 + 420 + 12

= 2232

(iv) 402 × 7

Ans:

402 × 7 = (400 + 2) × 7

= 2800 + 14

= 2814

(v) 752 × 3

Ans:

752 × 3 = (700 + 50 + 2) × 3

= 2100 + 150 + 6

= 2256

Exercise (Text Book Page No. 16):

Question 1.

Find the product using standard algorithm.

(i) 20 × 2 = ___

Ans:

40

(ii) 21 × 4 = ___

Ans:

84

(iii) 65 × 5 = ___

Ans:

325

(iv) 14 × 3 = ___

Ans:

42

(v) 26 × 10 = ___

Ans:

260

Question 2.

Complete the following table.

i) If the cost of one pen is ₹ 5, what will be the cost of 8 pens?

Ans:

8 × 5 = 40

ii) If there are 7 balls in a bag, how many balls will be there in 4 bags?

4 × 7 = ___

Ans:

4 × 7 = 28

iii) If the cost of one book is ₹ 10, what will be the cost of 7 books?

___ × 10 = ___

Ans:

10 × 7 = 70

iv) If there are 6 buttons in a shirt, how many buttons will be there in 3 shirts?

___ × + ___ = ___

Ans:

6 × 3 = 18

Question 3.

Find the product of the following numbers using lattice multiplication.

i) 22 × 25

Ans:

22 × 25 = 550

ii) 34 × 51

Ans:

34 × 51 = 1734

iii) 45 × 24

Ans:

45 × 24 = 1080

Exercise (Text Book Page No. 18):

Question 1.

If there are 4 toys in a box. How many toys will be there in 9 boxes?

Ans:

Number of Boxes = 9

Number of toys in each box = 4

Total number of toys = 9 × 4 = 36

Question 2.

If there are 3 colour pencils in a packet. How many pencils will be there in 9 packets.

Ans:

Number of packets = 9

Number of colour pencils in each packet = 3

Total number of colour pencils = 9 × 3 = 27

Question 3.

Write the multiplication fact for the following products

Ans:

**3rd Standard Maths Guide Numbers Additional Questions and Answers**

I. Fill in the boxes.

(i) 2 × 7 =

Ans:

14

(ii) 6 × 2 =

Ans:

12

(iii) × 2 = 20

Ans:

10

(iv) 2 × 9 =

Ans:

18

(v) 2 × 5 =

Ans:

10

(vi) 2 × 4 =

Ans:

8

(vii) 3 × 8 =

Ans:

24

(viii) 6 × 3 =

Ans:

18

(ix) 7 × = 21

Ans:

3

(x) 10 × 4 =

Ans:

40

(xi) 3 × 4 =

Ans:

12

(xii) 4 × = 20

Ans:

5

(xiii) 6 × = 30

Ans:

5

(xiv) 7 × 5 =

Ans:

35

(xv) 2 × = 20

Ans:

10

II. Multiply the following numbers by regrouping.

(i) 57 × 8

Ans:

57 × 8 = (50 + 7) × 8

= 400 + 56

= 456

(ii) 65 × 7

Ans:

65 × 7 = (60 + 5) × 7

= 420 + 35

= 455

(iii) 841 × 4

Ans:

841 × 4 = (800 + 40 + 1) × 4

= 3200 + 160 + 4

= 3364

III. Find the product using standard algorithm.

(i) 32 × 5

Ans:

32 × 5 = 160

(ii) 17 × 4

Ans:

17 × 4 = 68

(iii) 46 × 3

Ans:

46 × 3 = 138

IV. Find the product of the following numbers using lattice multiplication.

(i) 33 × 45

Ans:

33 × 45 = 1485

(ii) 47 × 22

Ans:

47 × 22 = 1034

(iii) 56 × 61

Ans:

56 × 61 = 3416

V. Story Problem.

Question 1.

If there are 5 chocolate in a box. How many chocolates will be there in 8 boxes?

Ans:

Number of boxes = 8

Number of chocolates in each box = 5

∴ Total number of chocolates = 8 × 5 = 40

Question 2.

If the cost of one pen is ₹ 6, what will be the cost of 3 pens?

Answer:

Number of pens = 3

Cost of one pen = ₹ 6

Total cost of 3 pens = 3 × 6 = ₹ 18